TRINITY YOUTH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childcare; Youth Work and related Training. Help and support for young people who are Not in Education Employment or Training. Work with young people who are Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual and Transgendered. Work with young people who have special needs. Street Youth Work. Junior youth Work Baby sitting and other childcare related work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 21 October 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIMM LAWSON | Chair |
|
||||||
PAUL VURLAN | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julia Masters | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Luke Daley | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY ANNE MCLEOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.39k | £238.50k | £248.01k | £149.10k | £225.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £250.87k | £256.02k | £238.11k | £172.29k | £235.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.30k | £14.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 MAR 2012 as amended on 25 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
The objects for which the Company is established are: b) To help and educated young people in the North East of England, through their leisure time activities, so as to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved. c) To provide the necessary facilities for the daily care, recreation and education of children during out of school hours and school holidays. d) To advance the education and training of the persons in the provision of such care, education and recreational facilities. e) To educate and support the parents of beneficiaries in order to improve the family environment of those children and young people.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRP ADVISORY TRADING LIMITED
BULMAN HOUSE
REGENT CENTRE
GOSFORTH
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 3LS
- Phone:
- 01916053737
- Email:
- SARAH.DORKIN@FRPADVISORY.COM
- Website:
-
WWW.FRPADVISORY.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window