Governing document CARERS TRUST MID YORKSHIRE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 NOV 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 MAR 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 AUG 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08 AUG 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 APR 2018 as amended on 19 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
3. Objects The Company's Objects are specifically restricted to the following: 3.1 The relief of those in need by reason of age, ill health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage through the provision of comprehensive support services for carers across the area of mid Yorkshire as agreed by the Board. 3.2 The assistance of carers in need including by raising awareness of issues affecting carers 3.3 The promotion of carers and effectiveness of charities which operate for the care and support of carers.
Area of benefit
MID-YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.