Trustees CARERS TRUST MID YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1069331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Edwards Chair 01 January 2024
None on record
Ty Platten Trustee 02 December 2024
None on record
Peter Lyster Trustee 12 August 2024
None on record
Ovidiu Staicu Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Cheryl Lythgoe Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Rachel Livermore Trustee 24 October 2023
ROSETREES
Received: On time
Thomas Stockdale Carter Trustee 17 August 2023
None on record