Governing document RADLETT REFORM SYNAGOGUE
Charity Number: 1071255
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LAWS ADOPTED 14/03/1972 AS AMENDED 08/12/1982, 23/07/1998, 31/05/2000, 26/02/2004, 27/09/2004, 22/03/2007 AND 15/05/2014
Charitable objects
PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A SYNAGOGUE FOR THE PURPOSE OF PUBLIC WORSHIP AND ADVANCING RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HERTFORDSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.