Financial history THE HIGH SHERIFF OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE'S AWARD FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity number: 1071290
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £9.88k £22.30k £43.92k £10.82k £28.52k
Total expenditure £16.22k £18.80k £35.41k £8.76k £16.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A