THE HONINGHAM CHURCH BUILDING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance and upkeep of Church of St Andrew Honingham (two star listed building)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 06 April 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAYMOND GEORGE SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID SYMONDS HOOKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £368 | £1.26k | £1.62k | £2.61k | £3.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 31ST DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
(A) FOR THE RESTORATION PRESERVATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF THE CHURCH OF SAINT ANDREW'S, HONINGHAM IN THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH AND THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND OF THE MONUMENTS FITTINGS FIXTURES STAINED GLASS FURNITURE ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND OF THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH. (B) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE SAID COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND THE SAID DIOCESE TO PRESERVE REPAIR MAINTAIN IMPROVE BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT THE CHURCH AS A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE OR ARCHITECTURAL VALUE IN THE EVENT OF THE CHURCH BEING DECLARED REDUNDANT BY A PASTORAL SCHEME MADE UNDER THE PASTORAL MEASURE 1983 (OR ANY STATUTORY MODIFICATION OR RE-ENACTMENT THEREOF) OR OTHERWISE CEASING TO BE USED REGULARLY FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP AND THE MONUMENTS FITTINGS FIXTURES STAINED GLASS FURNITURE ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING THERETO.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF NORWICH AND THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH FARM HOUSE
HONINGHAM
NORWICH
NR9 5BT
- Phone:
- 01603880323
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window