PETERBOROUGH CROSSROADS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 11 June 1998: Standard registration
- 02 June 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.57k | £91.48k | £100.25k | £52.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.68k | £97.68k | £106.37k | £46.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 01 September 2008 | 214 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 09 February 2007 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 26 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 26 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS AND PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME BY OFFERING A RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY BASED CARE ATTENDANTS AND, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE AND IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES, TO PROVIDE SUCH CARE ATTENDANTS FOR DISABLED PEOPLE LIVING ALONE. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE THAT COVERED BY PETERBOROUGH UNITARY AUTHORITY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
PETERBOROUGH UNITARY AUTHORITY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window