Trustees LITTLE STARS CHRISTIAN PRESCHOOL
Charity Number: 1070709

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Michael Doncaster | Chair | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Louise Barge | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Kilgour | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sara Diane Rouse | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Komborerai Blessing Simango | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.