Financial history MATERNAL AND CHILDHEALTH ADVOCACY INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1071486
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2007 31/10/2008 31/10/2009 31/10/2010 31/10/2011
Total gross income £370.36k £384.06k £495.29k £439.20k £366.10k
Total expenditure £506.00k £393.50k £387.41k £454.63k £425.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A