WATERSIDE ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further education in the arts in its widest sense in the Waterside Parishes of the New Forest, through Festivals of music, art, dance and drama. It is an enabling organisation bringing together local groups and providing venues for them to perform, along with publicity and general administration. The trustees can also help other like-minded organisations within their geographical area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 25 June 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Jane Radmore | Chair | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Chown | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Bradley | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £804 | £0 | £0 | £19.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5 | £500 | £0 | £500 | £14.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 1998 AND AMENDED ON 30 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN MUSIC, DRAMA, ART AND THE PERFORMING ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 West Road
Dibden Purlieu
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 4RH
- Phone:
- 07946666395
- Website:
-
watersidearts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window