SHROPSHIRE CAT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide shelter, food, veterinary care for homeless, stray, abandoned and unwanted cats and kittens. To re-home said animals where possible. To benefit the community by trapping & neutering feral cats thus limiting their numbers to avoid health hazards and nuisance. To educate the public on health and care of cats and kittens in order to alleviate and obviate distress and cruelty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 07 October 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARION MICKLEWRIGHT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Savina Barnes | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Rushby | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Phillips | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Marie Beaumont | Trustee | 28 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Margaret Lloyd | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.16k | £176.10k | £349.39k | £298.42k | £328.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.18k | £114.60k | £121.48k | £223.43k | £230.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.05k | £10.82k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 FEBRUARY 1998 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 3 AUGUST 1998 as amended on 19 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
1. For the benefit of the public to relieve the suffering of cats and kittens in need of care and attention and, in particular, to provide and maintain a rescue centre for the reception, care, treatment and to seek new homes for such animals. Where appropriate, to facilitate attempts to reunite owners with their pets and to provide lifelong care for animals that cannot be rehomed. 2. To promote humane behaviour towards cats and kittens by providing appropriate care, protection, treatment and security for cats and kittens which are in need of care and attention by reason of sickness, maltreatment, poor circumstances or ill usage, and by trapping, neutering and re-releasing feral cats. 3. To advance the education of the public in matters pertaining to animal welfare in general, the prevention of cruelty and suffering among animals and to demonstrate nurturing and compassion for nature, the environment and life. 4. For the advancement of animal welfare by the provision of financial assistance towards neutering and, where appropriate and in exceptional circumstances, veterinary care to individuals who are suffering from financial hardship and would be otherwise unable to afford treatment for their cat. 5. To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded, assisting them to integrate into society and promoting their physical, social and emotional wellbeing, in particular by providing social and recreational facilities and events involving the local community. For the purpose of this clause ?socially excluded? means being excluded from society, or parts of society, as a result of one or more of the following factors: unemployment, financial hardship, youth or old age, ill health (physical and mental), discrimination on the grounds of sex, race, disability, ethnic origin, religion, belief, sexual orientation or gender reassignment, Armed Forces communities, refugee or asylum seeker status.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINDYRIDGE
LYTH HILL ROAD
BAYSTON HILL
SHREWSBURY
SY3 0AU
- Phone:
- 01743872857
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window