Financial history CODA MUSIC AND ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1068710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £307.88k £274.56k £347.46k £914.33k £931.93k
Total expenditure £289.96k £219.75k £282.13k £505.00k £384.59k
Income from government contracts £14.75k £21.34k £6.58k £20.58k £4.64k
Income from government grants £4.25k £64.71k £14.00k £500 £318.17k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £663.80k £673.09k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £244.86k £240.47k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £305.21k
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £5.68k £18.38k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £500.91k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £504.71k £383.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £290 £729
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £19.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0