THE ST. ENDELLION EASTER FESTIVAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The St Endellion Easter Festival brings together a wide range of exciting musicians, orchestral and choral, at Eastertide each year, to perform in the Collegiate Church of St Endelienta, St Endellion, near Port Isaac, North Cornwall (on B3314, 6m North of Wadebridge).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 22 September 1998: Standard registration
- 14 April 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 14 April 2010: Funds transferred to 266430 THE ST ENDELLION FESTIVAL TRUST
- ST. ENDELLION EASTER FESTIVAL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.24k | £28.72k | £32.14k | £36.56k | £48.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.37k | £32.60k | £33.94k | £35.23k | £37.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 22 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | 23 March 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 19 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | 01 April 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 20 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | 25 February 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 16 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | 16 February 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 09 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | 09 August 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH JULY 1998
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, AND IN PARTICULAR ( BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DRAMA AND POETRY BY: (I) THE PROMOTION OF AN EASTER FESTIVAL OF MUSIC, DRAMA AND POETRY; (II) THE PROMOTION, OR GIVING ASSISTANCE TO THE PROMOTION, OF CONCERTS AND RECITALS, DRAMA PERFORMANCES, EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES AND OTHER ARTS EVENTS ANYWHERE ELSE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; (III) ANY SUCH OTHER WHOLLY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY ASSISTING WITH THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND REPLACEMENT (AS APPROPRIATE) OF THE FABRIC AND FURNISHINGS (INCLUDING THE ORGAN) OF THE COLLEGIATE CHURCH OF ST. ENDELLION, AND SUCH OTHER CHURCHES IN CURRENT USE AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE; (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.IN PRACTICE IN ST. ENDELLION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window