COMPUTERS FOR THE DISABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE COMPUTER SYSTEMS AND LAPTOPS FOR THE DISABLED/HOUSEBOUND BY SOURCING AT A MINIMUM (OR NO COST), SECOND HAND OR NEW PARTS AND/OR COMPONENTS TO ASSEMBLE SAID SYSTEMS. WE ALSO CAN PEOPLE USE A COMPUTER
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 20 May 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL HARRIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Louisa Connor | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAREN HARRIS | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.30k | £16.66k | £18.00k | £6.00k | £740 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.26k | £19.03k | £17.00k | £7.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE COMPUTER SYSTEMS FOR THE DISABLED/HOUSEBOUND BY SOURCING AT A MINIMUM (OR NO COST), SECOND HAND OR NEW PARTS AND/OR COMPONENTS TO ASSEMBLE SAID SYSTEMS. (B) TO DELIVER AND INSTAL SAID SYSTEMS AND INDUCT USER IN THE SYSTEM PROVIDED, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE DISABLED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 NEW WAVERLEY ROAD
BASILDON
SS15 4BJ
- Phone:
- 01268284834
- Email:
- bigpaulh@blueyonder.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window