THE BRITISH SPOTTED PONY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to preserve, protect and improve the British Spotted Pony.We keep studbooks, foster interest in the breed. We encourage and promote the production of the British Spotted Pony for riding, driving and showing. We produce newsletters and have a website. We hold an annual show and we help & advise members on all aspects of keeping and breeding spotted ponies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Devon
- Lancashire
- Somerset
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 06 May 1998: Standard registration
- BSPPS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vanessa Marie Gaskell | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Wolstenholme | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Alice Perry-Evans | Trustee | 19 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Zena Margaret JACKSON | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.08k | £12.50k | £18.01k | £18.41k | £26.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.64k | £10.83k | £19.67k | £20.75k | £24.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 March 2021 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 MAY 1998 AND 11 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF BREEDING OF BRITISH SPOTTED PONIES OF GOOD CONFORMATION, DISTINGUISHING CHARACTERISTICS AND FREE FROM DEFECT; PONIES TO BE OF RIDING, DRIVING OR COB TYPE FROM MINIATURES TO 14.2 HH (147CM) INCLUSIVE TO PROTECT THE BRITISH SPOTTED PONY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Main Street
Halton
Runcorn
WA7 2AX
- Phone:
- 07774714638
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window