Financial history THE EDWARD GOSTLING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1068617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.19m £4.06m £3.77m £3.79m £3.41m
Total expenditure £8.77m £6.86m £9.77m £14.95m £15.29m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.19m £4.05m £3.77m £3.79m £3.41m
Income - Other £0 £10.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.94m £4.78m £8.02m £13.92m £14.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.83m £2.08m £1.76m £1.04m £573.05k
Expenditure - Governance £28.75k £26.40k £27.75k £30.93k £33.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.27m £3.75m £7.75m £13.46m £13.96m
Expenditure - Investment management £389.97k £429.81k £295.74k £151.24k £125.62k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0