Accounts and annual returns PARENT, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS OF RHAYADER SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1076112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 02 January 2025 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2022 23 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2021 07 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 13 April 2021 286 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required