BETTER BRAYBROOKE (ENVIRONMENTAL WATCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve The Braybrooke Ward by association with local authorities, voluntary organisations and residents by campaigning on issues affecting the quality of life and encouraging environmental improvements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 09 July 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GODFREY DANIEL | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02k | £806 | £807 | £13.40k | £2.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.01k | £220 | £220 | £564 | £13.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 July 2024 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH JANUARY 1997, AND AMENDED 9TH JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO IMPROVE THE BRAYBROOKE WARD NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR NATIONALITY, OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO IMPROVE THE ENVIRONMENT,TO CAMPAIGN ON ISSUES AFFECTING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OR SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR RESIDENTS AND PROTECTING THEIR ENVIRONMENT. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
BRAYBROOKE WARD NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 Lower Park Road
HASTINGS
East Sussex
TN34 2LE
- Phone:
- 01424 721365
- Email:
- robin.holmes5@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window