NATIONAL GAMETE DONATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with potential recipients and donors, UK licensed fertility clinics, the media and support organisations to raise awareness of the need for gamete donors. We manage the voluntary contact register to enable people conceived through donated sperm or eggs, their donors and half-siblings before August 1991 to exchange information and, where desired, to contact each other.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £100,000 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 April 1998: Standard registration
- 26 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NGDT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.85k | £74.56k | £142.25k | £161.57k | £154.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.20k | £93.08k | £133.23k | £158.96k | £190.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £160.13k | £100.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 30 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 30 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 02/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/06/2009 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/05/2015
Charitable objects
'TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HUMAN FERTILITY, FERTILISATION AND EMBRYOLOGY, ASSISTED CONCEPTION, GENETICS AND THE NEED FOR EGG, SPERM AND EMBRYO DONORS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO DONORS AND POTENTIAL DONORS AND TO CONCERNED STAKEHOLDERS TO BENEFIT THE TREATMENT OF INFERTILITY BY PROMOTING THE RECRUITMENT OF GAMETE (EGG AND SPERM) AND EMBRYO DONORS AND MAINTAINING NATIONAL INITIATIVES TO ENABLE A REGULAR AND EVEN SUPPLY OF GAMETES AND/OR EMBRYOS TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF DONOR CONCEIVED OFFSPRING, THEIR FAMILIES AND DONORS BY THE PROVISION OF: A DONOR CONCEIVED REGISTER; SERVICES FOR MATCHING DONORS, OFFSPRING, AND SIBLINGS; AND THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE SUPPORT AND ADVICE FOR DONORS, OFFSPRING, SIBLINGS, AND THEIR FAMILIES'.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window