WORLD MUSLIM CONGRESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION AND TRAINING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Greenwich
Governance
- 05 February 1999: Standard registration
- WMC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR NASSEEF | Chair |
|
||||
Dr TARIQ J ABBASI | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/08/2020 | 13/08/2021 | 13/08/2022 | 13/08/2023 | 13/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £2.46k | £1.87k | £2.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £1.90k | £1.39k | £2.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 August 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 August 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 August 2020 | 10 May 2022 | 331 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST SEALED ON 1ST DECEMBER 1998.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST MUSLIMS 2) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION PARTICULARLY OF MUSLIMS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE. 3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATION SERVICES AND SUPPORT TO MUSLIMS IN NEED. 4) TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF ISLAM. 5) TO PROMOTE GOOD RACE AND COMMUNITY RELATIONS WITH OTHER ETHNIC COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 BANNOCKBURN ROAD
LONDON
SE18 1ES
- Phone:
- 02088542038
- Email:
- motamaruk@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window