THE FRIENDS OF ST MATTHIAS ' CHURCH, ILSHAM, TORQUAY, DEVON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are the advancement of the christian religion, in particular through the maintenance of and alterations and improvements to the buildings and grounds of St Matthias' Church, Torquay, and its church centre. This is achieved through fundraising and the commissioning of projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Torbay
Governance
- 25 August 1998: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF ST MATTHIAS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert David Newman | Chair | 01 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Peter Nicholas Hewlitt | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Marguerite Helen Aspinall | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Monica Rook | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Whittaker | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Dickinson | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Marjorie Broadhead | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Waugh | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Tibbetts | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.85k | £1.50k | £37.74k | £20.53k | £4.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.30k | £10.24k | £1.11k | £15.53k | £3.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAY 1999, AS AMENDED 26 MAY 2004,
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE OF AND ALTERATIONS AND IMPROVEMENTS TO THE BUILDINGS AND GROUNDS OF ST MATTHIAS CHURCH AND ITS CHURCH CENTRE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE IN ST MATTHIAS, TORQUAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 GREAT HEADLAND ROAD
PAIGNTON
TQ3 2DY
- Phone:
- 01803 524215
- Email:
- rob.thenewmans@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window