Trustees FRIENDS OF BISHOP'S CASTLE LIBRARY

Charity number: 1068901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Price Chair 26 November 2014
None on record
Rachel Katherine Hawes Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Iris Briscoe Trustee 27 November 2019
None on record
ruth houghton Trustee 15 September 2016
None on record
Sue Willmer Trustee 13 January 2016
None on record
Pat Morrison Trustee 02 December 2015
None on record
Alison Gouldstone Trustee 26 October 2015
None on record
JANE MORRIS Trustee
None on record