THE FRIENDS OF ST MILDRED'S CHURCH CANTERBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance in the maintenance of the fabric of the parish church of St. Mildred's, Canterbury and in its preservation & protection and the promotion of its use for various social purposes by local residents & others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 03 June 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tessa Taylor | Chair | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
DEAN LAURENT BUBIER | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY PHILIP DAWKINGS | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP CHEETHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ERNEST ELLABY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM RENNELLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.89k | £657 | £1.07k | £2.97k | £3.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £340 | £45 | £10 | £2.12k | £5.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 1ST MAY 1998
Charitable objects
THE FRIENDS IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY ASSISTING IN THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. MILDRED'S, CANTERBURY AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT IT AS A PLACE OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP..
Area of benefit
CANTERBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Henry Court
Gordon Road
South Canterbury
CANTERBURY
CT1 3PL
- Phone:
- 07936358631
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window