THE INTER FAITH NETWORK FOR THE UNITED KINGDOM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Led by its multi faith Board, co-chaired by Canon Hilary Barber and Narendra Waghela, IFN works with its member bodies and others to advance public knowledge and mutual understanding of the teachings, traditions and practices of different faith communities in Britain and to promote good relations between persons of different faiths.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £125,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 March 1998: Standard registration
- 11 February 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £447.24k | £372.38k | £395.40k | £343.25k | £480.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £438.62k | £368.88k | £379.80k | £390.41k | £591.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £385.00k | £238.94k | £340.74k | £212.50k | £125.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/10/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/2014 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 JUN 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JUN 2022
Charitable objects
THE NETWORK IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING OF THE TEACHINGS, TRADITIONS AND PRACTICES OF THE DIFFERENT FAITH COMMUNITIES IN BRITAIN INCLUDING AN AWARENESS BOTH OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND AND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window