CHAPELTOWN AND HAREHILLS REGENERATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leeds City
Governance
- 06 July 1998: Standard registration
- 22 April 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHART (Working name)
- CHEL COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.30k | £821 | £1.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.49k | £3.88k | £3.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 15 February 2006 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 MAY 1998 AND 6 AUGUST 1999.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF LEEDS, AND IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF CHAPELTOWN AND HAREHILLS, INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING, AND THE PROVISION (OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION ) OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SAID PERSONS; AND IN PARTICULAR (B) TO SUPPORT AND FACILITATE ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE ARTS AND CULTURE IN THE AREA OF CHAPELTOWN AND HAREHILLS; (C) TO SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING TO ENABLE THE GAINING OF EMPLOYMENT AND INDIVIDUAL DEVELOPMENT; (D) TO ENHANCE PUBLIC SAFETY
Area of benefit
LEEDS AND IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF CHAPELTOWN AND HAREHILLS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window