Accounts and annual returns ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT, WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity number: 1090983
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 10 February 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 10 February 2025 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 10 February 2025 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 10 February 2025 371 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 14 February 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 02 March 2023 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 April 2021 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 23 April 2021 77 days late Download Open in new window