Financial history ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT, WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity Number: 1090983
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £88.68k £88.68k £47.43k £68.55k £69.89k
Total expenditure £66.63k £66.63k £43.48k £78.90k £68.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A