Trustees NATIONS TRUST
Charity number: 1069419

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR STEPHEN MICHAEL GARSTIN COUPE | Chair | 10 November 1999 |
|
|
||||
Suk Kwang Jung | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jungbeom Kim | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hyunil Joo | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mr STEPHEN JOHN GRINDROD | Trustee | 15 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATHLEEN ANNE COUPE | Trustee | 10 November 1999 |
|
|
||||
MR ROBERT NOEL CHIRGWIN | Trustee | 13 June 1998 |
|
|
||||
MS GAIL LOUISE DIXON | Trustee | 13 June 1998 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.