Financial history HALTON VILLAGE MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1068775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.07k £636 £2.68k £12.27k £5.07k
Total expenditure £7.20k £563 £2.18k £3.97k £10.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £7.92k N/A