Financial history NEWSTART

Charity number: 1077664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £77.84k £72.23k £98.12k £68.23k £71.22k
Total expenditure £66.45k £68.33k £73.94k £71.12k £73.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £38.00k N/A N/A N/A