WALSALL SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Walsall Society for the Blind mission is to provide information, support and friendship to all the visually impaired people within the Borough of Walsall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £18,623 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Walsall
Governance
- 07 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN HAROLD COOKE JP | Chair |
|
||||||
Timothy Clifft | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amara Ismail-El-Banna | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Merchant | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD MEERE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.25k | £378.58k | £421.76k | £341.59k | £325.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £253.51k | £270.21k | £267.81k | £356.78k | £389.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £16.45k | £18.62k | £18.62k | £18.62k | £18.62k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SUCH ASSISTANCE AND SERVICES AS ARE THOUGH FIT TO THOSE BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS REGISTERED AS SUCH OR CAPABLE OF REGISTRATION AS SUCH, AND RESIDING WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WALSALL AND ITS IMMEDIATE ENVIRONS AND SUCH OTHER PERSONS, HAVING A SUBSTANTIAL VISUAL IMPAIRMENT AS THE CHARITY MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS MEMORANDUM THE WORDS "BLIND" AND "BLIND PERSONS" SHALL INCLUDE PERSONS WHO THOUGH NOT TOTALLY BLIND ARE SUBSTANTIALLY VISUALLY IMPAIRED AND WHO ARE THE INTENDED RECIPIENTS OF THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WALSALL AND ITS IMMEDIATE ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAWLEY HOUSE
11 HATHERTON ROAD
WALSALL
WEST MIDLANDS
WS1 1XS
- Phone:
- 01922627683
- Email:
- hawleyhouse@wsftb.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window