Governing document COMMUNITY FIRST NEW FOREST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEM AND ARTS OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED 8 OCTOBER 2002, 26 OCTOBER 2005 AND CERT OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 OCTOBER 2009. NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AS ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED 19/11/13
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE AUTHORITIES COMPRISING THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE (INCLUDING PORTSMOUTH AND SOUTHAMPTON) AND IN PARTICULAR THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF THE NEW FOREST AND, IF THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") SHALL SO DECIDE, IN ANY OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE AUTHORITIES IMMEDIATELY ADJOINING (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, AND IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID PURPOSES TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE SAME AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NEW FOREST
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.