Accounts and annual returns SPANISH YOUTH SERVICE

Charity number: 1072887
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 08 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2004 07 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2004 Not Required