Accounts and annual returns SACHKHAND NANAK DHAM (DARSHAN DARBAR) UK

Charity number: 1071912
Charity reporting is up to date (120 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 27 November 2024 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 November 2024 120 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 11 January 2024 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 11 January 2024 165 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 04 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 15 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 15 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window