SACHKHAND NANAK DHAM (DARSHAN DARBAR) UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO DELIVER THE TEACHINGS OF THE FOUNDER HIS HOLINESS HAZUR MAHRAZ DARSHAN DAS JI, AND THROUGH THE TEACHINGS AND LEADERSHIP OF THE HEAD & PATRON OF SACHKHAND NANAK DHAM HIS HOLINESS HAZUR MAHRAZ TIRLOCHAN DARSHAN DAS JI, THROUGH SPIRITUAL DISCOURSES AND EVENTS AT THE: SACHKHAND NANAK DHAM (DARSHAN DARBAR) 25 North Park Richings Park Iver SL0 9DH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 09 October 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BALJINDER SINGH | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
tirlochan das | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
JASPAL SINGH BHAMBRA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BALDEV SINGH BAHL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.70k | £227.94k | £528.25k | £539.35k | £375.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.85k | £186.27k | £183.92k | £286.87k | £365.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £464.04k | £421.92k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £21.36k | £21.33k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £42.86k | £96.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £34.98k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £147.67k | £286.87k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £34.98k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £1.26k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 November 2024 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2023
(These accounts |
27 November 2024 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 165 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH (A) THE TEACHINGS OF SIRI GURU GRANTH SAHIB JEE AS EXPOUNDED BY HAZUR MAHRAZ DARSHAN DAS JEE AND IN DOING SO TO BRING MAN TO A GREATER REALISATION OF GOD AND (B) THE TEACHINGS, PHILOSOPHY AND IDEOLOGY OF THE FOUNDER OF SACHKHAND NANAK DHAM, HAZUR MAHRAZ DARSHAN DAS AND (C) THE PRINCIPLES OF DAS DHARAM WHICH WAS FOUNDED BY HAZUR MAHRAZ DARSHAN DAS. 2) TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED THE AGED, DISABLED, ORPHANS AND OTHER CHILDREN WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 North Park
Richings Park
IVER
SL0 9DH
- Phone:
- 07932766848
- Email:
- info@sachkhandnanakdham.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window