ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION (NORWICH BRANCH)

Charity number: 1068699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising money to support branch activities and national charities of a nautical nature. To assist any charity when its support is to the benefit of the reputation and best interests of the association, and to support any youth organisation with a specific nautical connection such as sea cadet associations and sea scouts

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,866
Total expenditure: £10,168

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 March 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN CHARLES PHILLIPS Chair 12 March 2019
None on record
Rachel Barber Trustee 03 April 2024
None on record
Neil Hall Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record
DIANA ROSALIND Sadler Trustee 09 March 2021
None on record
LT CDR STUART REGINALD FIDLER Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
PHILLIP COATES Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
NEVILLE PATRICK CHARLES TOWNSEND Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
MICHAEL ROY MIZEN Trustee 09 September 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.80k £7.14k £4.84k £7.88k £7.87k
Total expenditure £8.49k £4.11k £7.13k £8.03k £10.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 Church Road
Aslacton
NORWICH
NR15 2JH
Phone:
07816 469591