Accounts and annual returns THE ORLANDO CONSORT

Charity Number: 1068993
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 21 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 21 November 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On Time