Accounts and annual returns ASAHOLAH MINISTRIES OF GOD

Charity number: 1069779
Charity reporting is overdue by 1256 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 526 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 526 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 891 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 891 days
Annual return 31 January 2021 13 April 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1256 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 03 July 2021 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 03 July 2021 215 days late Download Open in new window