THE W O BENTLEY MEMORIAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Foundation is the advancement of public knowledge and appreciation of the Bentley Motorcar and its history by the establishment and maintenance of a museum, library and archive for the preservation, exhibition and study of the Collection.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 April 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Barton | Chair | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Dennis Gush | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nita Ewart | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ron Warmington | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Spencer Silverbach | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Dine | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Bodfish | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.38k | £49.66k | £48.68k | £55.25k | £56.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.24k | £40.49k | £54.55k | £65.57k | £65.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE OF THE BENTLEY MOTOR CAR AND ITS HISTORY BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM LIBRARY AND ARCHIVE FOR THE PRESERVATION EXHIBITION AND STUDY OF THE COLLECTION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
W O BENLEY MEMORIAL BUILDING
IRONSTONE LANE
WROXTON
BANBURY
OXFORDSHIRE
OX15 6ED
- Phone:
- 01295 738886
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window