FRIENDS OF HILLTOP PRIMARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise money to help pay for or subsidise school visits, events & activities for the children of Hill Top Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Doncaster
Governance
- 21 January 1999: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 September 2010: Standard registration
- EDLINGTON HILL TOP JUNIOR SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- EDLINGTON HILL TOP PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- HILL TOP PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly Marie Widdowson | Chair | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
KIMBERLEY CLOSE | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.69k | £1.77k | £605 | £0 | £446 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.92k | £1.93k | £319 | £0 | £777 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 16 JULY 1998 AS AMENDED 22 MAY 2002, AS AMENDED ON 11TH SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL, PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
EDLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
EDLINGTON LANE
EDLINGTON
DONCASTER
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
DN12 1PL
- Phone:
- 01709 863273
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window