THE CHELMSFORD CATHEDRAL SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of the pupils of the Cathedral School, Chelmsford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 09 April 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Lindsay Scott | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Sarah Wells | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Charles Baggs | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA WISKIN | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Kilbey | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alun Powell | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.29k | £13.57k | £10.77k | £14.37k | £15.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £800 | £3.68k | £2.68k | £1.96k | £18.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH OCTOBER 1997 AND DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 26TH JANUARY 1999 AND 19TH OCTOBER 1999.
Charitable objects
1.THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE ENDOWMENT FUND AND OF ALL OTHER MONEY OR PROPERTY WHICH MAY BE PAID OR TRANSFERRED TO THEM UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE SAME AND INCOME FROM THE ENDOWMENT FUND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE STATUTORY BODY WHICH MAINTAINS THE SCHOOL FOR THE TIME BEING AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES MAY UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SCHOOL AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF THE PUPILS. 2. TO APPLY SUCH SUM OR SUMS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME FROM THE NET ANNUAL INCOME AND OR CAPITAL OF THE ENDOWMENT FUND IN SUPPORTING THE SCHOOL AND IN PARTICULAR TO DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN THE FABRIC AND AMENITIES OF THE SCHOOL. 3. TO APPLY SUCH SUM OR SUMS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: 1. IN AWARDING TO PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL GRANTS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE THEM TO TRAVEL WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD IN FURTHERANCE OF THEIR EDUCATION; 2. IN OTHERWISE FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS. TO APPLY SUCH SUM IN WHATEVER OTHER CHARITABLE WAYS THAT THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER PROMOTE THE WELL BEING OF THE SCHOOL AND THE EDUCATION AND WELFARE OF THE PUPILS AND STAFF AT THE SCHOOL...
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Butlers Close
Broomfield
Chelmsford
CM1 7BE
- Phone:
- 01245442842
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window