THE ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The ELC promotes to promote for the benefit of the public the protection of health and the environment; to relieve the poor and those in need through the provisions of legal and medical services in matters relating to health and the environment; the advancement of education, training and research in matters relating to health, environment, medicine, law, human and fundamental rights;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 June 1998: Standard registration
- 09 December 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- EIC (ENVIRONMENTAL ILLNESS CLINIC) (Working name)
- HELP (HEALTH ENVIRONMENT LAW FOR PEOPLE) (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2004 | 28/02/2006 | 28/02/2007 | 30/03/2008 | 30/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.87k | £6.98k | £1.42k | £1.50k | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.07k | £8.19k | £6.82k | £1.50k | £195 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2009 | 16 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2008 | 04 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4TH JUNE 1998 AND 21 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PROTECTION AND ENHANCEMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH AND THE ENVIRONMENT; TO PROVIDE LEGAL, MEDICAL AND SCIENTIFIC SERVICES IN MATTERS RELATING TO PUBLIC HEALTH AND THE ENVIRONMENT; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RESEARCH IN MATTERS RELATING TO MEDICINE, SCIENCE, LAW, HUMAN AND FUNDAMENTAL RIGHTS IN CONNECTION WITH PUBLIC HEALTH AND THE ENVIRONMENT; AND TO PROMOTE GOOD PUBLIC HEALTH AND ENVIRONMENTAL PRACTICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window