Financial history SAHWR

Charity number: 1069612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £786.14k £673.51k £966.10k £882.68k £1.07m
Total expenditure £637.87k £664.90k £703.54k £782.09k £913.77k
Income from government contracts £195.56k £184.35k £385.03k £372.14k £152.84k
Income from government grants £84.90k £42.92k £17.36k £51.12k £152.84k
Income - Donations and legacies £203.65k £70.77k £143.13k £138.03k £47.10k
Income - Other trading activities £236 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £582.12k £588.24k £822.96k £743.84k £1.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £138 £9 £13 £814 £7.42k
Income - Other £0 £14.48k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £203.65k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £637.87k £656.26k £670.71k £738.87k £888.17k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £8.64k £32.83k £43.22k £25.60k
Expenditure - Governance £9.48k £7.60k £4.47k £5.20k £40.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0