Accounts and annual returns THE MACCLESFIELD AND DISTRICT DISABILITY INFORMATION BUREAU

Charity number: 1069163
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 19 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 19 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 22 September 2009 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 12 February 2009 12 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 19 February 2008 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 30 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 16 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 17 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 14 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 14 November 2005 On Time