Financial history THE MACCLESFIELD AND DISTRICT DISABILITY INFORMATION BUREAU

Charity number: 1069163
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £60.80k £139.92k £203.27k £203.33k £239.17k
Total expenditure £50.82k £116.92k £161.36k £170.78k £164.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A