THE MACCLESFIELD AND DISTRICT DISABILITY INFORMATION BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on all disability matters, benefits advocacy service, access audits, awareness training, dyslexia support, specialist support for people with visual impairment, IT learning centre offering accredited and non accredited courses and specialists in adapative technology hardware and software offering individual assessment and training in the use of adaptive technology software packages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 16 April 1998: Standard registration
- 15 January 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 January 2010: Funds transferred to 1124371 DISABILITY INFORMATION BUREAU
- D.I.B. (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.80k | £139.92k | £203.27k | £203.33k | £239.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.82k | £116.92k | £161.36k | £170.78k | £164.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 19 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 19 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 22 September 2009 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 12 February 2009 | 12 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 19 February 2008 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 30 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 16 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 17 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 14 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 14 November 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED 26 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES LIVING IN THE MACCLESFIELD AND DISTRICT AREA SO THAT THEY MAY LEAD ACTIVE AND FULFILLING LIVES INTEGRATED IN SOCIETY
Area of benefit
MACCLESFIELD AND DISTRICT AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window