WHITE HORSE DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1069590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

we help the elderly of Westbury and surrounding villages, giving them somewhere to meet friends catch up on local gossip,they also have a cooked meal,play bingo, excercises and we are hoping next year to have guest speakers on varied subjects,usually three day trips are organised seaside or garden centre,it also helps if we feel someone not looking ok we talk to our co ordinator.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £10,190
Total expenditure: £12,754

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 May 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUE EZRA Chair 10 May 2012
THE ROTARY CLUB OF WESTBURY CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Margaret Godfrey Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
Ann Burton Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
Gwen Hobbs Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
Joan Eggleton Trustee 24 January 2017
None on record
CHRISTINE LINDA MITCHELL Trustee 10 May 2012
None on record
JIM HEATH Trustee 10 May 2012
THE ROTARY CLUB OF WESTBURY CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £20.53k £9.33k £9.09k £22.83k £10.19k
Total expenditure £16.08k £5.27k £4.27k £12.80k £12.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.32k N/A N/A £8.16k £400

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 27 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 12 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
27 MANOR FIELDS
BRATTON
WESTBURY
BA13 4ST
Phone:
01380830554
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available