SLOUGH MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SMTC provides the entire local community with the affordable opportunity to learn about and be involved in the Performing Arts, by performing in our shows, being part of the production team or by attending our shows as a member of the audience
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Slough
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 03 April 1998: Standard registration
- 12 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SLOUGH WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD THEATRE COMPANY (SWMTC) (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.42k | £34.82k | £1.36k | £5.10k | £15.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.77k | £24.86k | £3.24k | £5.85k | £13.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | 29 March 2017 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | 03 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | 25 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS (TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window