Governing document FROME CANOE CLUB
Charity number: 1104728

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 16/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 19/08/2012 AS AMENDED ON 27 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED ON 20 FEB 2019 as amended on 19 Feb 2020 as amended on 29 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF MENDIP AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN THE SPORT OF KAYAKING AND CANOEING.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
FOR THE INHABITANTS OF MENDIP AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.