THE BLUE DOLPHIN CLUB

Charity number: 1069580
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Blue Dolphin Club provides about 18 adults with learning disabilities, with a regular club night, during which the members can participate in games, sports, arts & crafts, drama and other activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2020

Total income: £1,130
Total expenditure: £4,186

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Poole

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 1998: Standard registration
  • 10 December 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £5.98k £4.87k £3.80k £2.55k £1.13k
Total expenditure £5.53k £6.30k £5.36k £4.53k £4.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 12 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 08 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 08 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 03 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required